+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time