+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 9, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred: Fiscal Oversight
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 23, 2019, 12:00pm, SCR 2
- Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 15 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor