+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Defeated - AYES: 35 NOES: 115 PRESENT: 3
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time