+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Agriculture,Conservation,Parks & Nat Res
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time