+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor