+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor