+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 2
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 24, 2019, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Aging
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor