+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled