+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor