+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: International Trade and Job Creation
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor