+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Utilities
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Energy and the Environment
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor