+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (9)
1978H01.15H
Adopted
1978H01.13H
Returned
1978H01.11H
Distributed
1978H01.10H
Adopted
1978H01.08H
Distributed
1978H01.06H
Distributed
1978H01.05H
Distributed
1978H01.02H
Distributed
1978H01.01H
Adopted