+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 2007, 9:30AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 9
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Veterans
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor