+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor