+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor