+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Laid Over - Third Reading
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tourism
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor