+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 8, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 100 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating solely to labor organizations, was agreed to.
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
0360H02.04H
Distributed
0360H02.02H
Defeated
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor