+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 114 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 1
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Perfected
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 9, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 12, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor