+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
1841H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor