+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 6, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Policy
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 18, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor