+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Laid Over - HA 1/HCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor