+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Read Second Time
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
- Reported for Introduction - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted to Introduce
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Authorized - Delivered to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (14)
2377H01.23H
Distributed
2377H01.22H
Distributed
2377H01.21H
Distributed
2377H01.01H
Distributed
2377H01.20H
Distributed
2377H01.18H
Distributed
2377H01.17H
Distributed
2377H01.15H
Distributed
2377H01.16H
Distributed
2377H01.13H
Distributed
2377H01.14H
Distributed
2377H01.12H
Distributed
2377H01.08H
Distributed
2377H01.04H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor