+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 2007, 9:30AM,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Job Creation & Eco Dev
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor