+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor