+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time