+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Policy
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 16, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor