+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 15, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor