+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 28, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
- House Concurs - SS ADOPTED AYES: 146 NOES: 12
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 14
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Aging,Families, Mental & Public Health
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 2
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 113 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 3
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- SEE COMMENTS - EXECUTIVE SESSION WILL BE HELD ON 2/9/04
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 15, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor