+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
2003H01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor