+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Job Creation and Economic Development
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor