+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, May 4, 12 noon or upon morning recess, Senate Lounge
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Economic Development
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Perfected
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor