+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 118 NOES: 39
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor