+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor