+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor