+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, SCR 1
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Health and Pensions
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor