+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor