+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Action Postponed
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Pensions
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time