+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 9, 2007, 9:15AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 24, 2007, 8:15AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Seniors, Families & Public Health
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 1
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Student Achievement
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor