+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 156 NOES: 0
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 161 NOES: 0
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 9, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor