+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor