+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 1:15pm, Pershing Conference Room
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred: Fiscal Oversight
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Voted Do Pass
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 24, 2019, 7:00pm or upon afternoon recess, SCR 2, Executive Session may follow on HCS HB 824
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 18 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
1741H04.02H
Adopted
1741H04.01H
Adopted