+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Utilities
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Utility Infrastructure
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor