+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor