+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 1, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State - THIS BILL BECOMES EFFECTIVE AUG 28, 2007, EXCEPT FOR SECTIONS 143.782, 143.790, 313.321-376.960, 376.964-376.989, 376.1500-376.1532, AND 379.930 - 379.952 WHICH HAVE A JAN 1, 2008 EFFECTIVE DATE
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 11, 2007 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
- House Concurs - SS#2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYE: 104 NOES: 43
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 41
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Withdrawn
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#2/SCS, SA 1 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS/SCS PENDING
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, MAY 7, 2007, 1:00PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 24, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Health and Mental Health
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 4
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HCS PENDING
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - No Action Taken
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Health Insurance
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor