+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1, HCA 2 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
0750H01.02H
Distributed
0750H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor