+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- 4/06/2005
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor