+ − Actions (29)
On July 10, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 000
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
- SCS Adopted
On April 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Local Government & Economic Development
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 001
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections & State Institutions
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor