+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from Consent Calendar
- Returned to Committee of Origin
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass Consent
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 13, 2017, 8:15am, Senate Lounge
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Consent and House Procedure
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor