+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 1
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor