+ − Actions (38)
On June 22, 2001 in the House:
- Vetoed in Part by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 9, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 008
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
On May 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute - YEAS:033 NAYS:000
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 00
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES GREEN 73, WILSON 42, KELLY 27, LEGAN AND BEARDEN
On April 23, 2001 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On April 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS RUSSELL, ROHRBACH, WESTFALL, GOODE AND WIGGINS
On April 19, 2001 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00
- SCS Adopted
On April 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Appropriations
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 005
On March 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
- Read Second Time
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor